open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00700
    Party Name:Boston v. Phoenix, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1239745
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =