open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00768
    Party Name:Brooks et al v. Mesa, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1240192
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =