open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00779
    Party Name:Byzantine Catholic Eparchy of Phoenix v. Burri Law PA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1240252
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =