open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00818
    Party Name:Denk v. Peoria, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1240499
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =