open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00909
    Party Name:Lopez-Osuna v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 11, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1241087
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =