open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00926
    Party Name:Lara et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received ]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1241288
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =