open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00934--JZB
    Party Name:Rodriguez #041478 v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:October 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Docs Received for Service]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1241247
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =