open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00976--MHB
    Party Name:Harris v. Mesa Police Department et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Aside Judgment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1241499
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =