open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01016
    Party Name:Phoenix, City of et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:October 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1241702
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =