open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01056
    Party Name:Thorsen et al v. Enterprise Leasing Company of Phoenix LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1241996
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =