open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01141
    Party Name:Saccoccio v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1242442
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =