open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01149
    Party Name:Stokes v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:October 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:October 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1242462
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =