open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01157
    Party Name:Leavelle v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1242529
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =