open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01159
    Party Name:Heckman v. Rio Verde Community Association
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counterclaim ]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:June 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1242571
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =