open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01401
    Party Name:Stickney v. Phoenix, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:October 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1244184
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =