open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02178
    Party Name:Hill #282429 v. Maricopa, County of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1166072
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =