open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-02613
    Party Name:Hill #282429 v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Docs Received for Service]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1117938
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =