open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01491
    Party Name:Kraft v. Maricopa, County of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Unexecuted]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1245026
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =