open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-cv-01569
    Party Name:Tomaszewski et al v. Circle K Stores Incorporated
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1245582
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =