open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-bk-09123-
    Party Name:WENDY SUE COBO
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13 (Reinstatements/Amended)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?777068
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =