open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:20-bk-09125-
    Party Name:LAWRENCE EDWARD RASNAKE and CHRISTOPHER JOHN DOBBS
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oExtend Time to File Chapter 13 Plan (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend Time to File Chapter 13 Plan (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13 (Reinstatements/Amended)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?777070
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =