open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:20-bk-11549-
    Party Name:DIANA CHRISTINA DOMINGUEZ
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Schedules]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint (Reinstatements/Amended/Conversions)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?779564
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =