U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02741
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Arizona, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2024: [New Case Opened]
  • October 10, 2024: [Service Executed]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.