U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01657
  • Case Name: Bantz v. AJR360 LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.