U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00668
  • Case Name: Salazar v. Thunderbird Restaurants LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report - Status]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report - Other]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 10, 2024: [Counterclaim ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.