U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01013
  • Case Name: G & G Closed Circuit Events LLC v. Shelbourne et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Stipulation ]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order to Show Cause ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.