U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01539
  • Case Name: Osterhaus Pharmacy Incorporated et al v. CVS Health Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals - Fees]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Declaration]
  • October 10, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.