U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02738
  • Case Name: Childs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief - Response]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice - SS Action Commenced]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 10, 2024: [New Case Opened]
  • October 10, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 10, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.