U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02241
  • Case Name: Ruiz v. Arizona, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2024: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.