U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Netrition Incorporated v. Tylers Coffee LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.