U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01068
  • Case Name: RB Distribution Incorporated et al v. Skyward Automotive Products LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.