U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00747
  • Case Name: Gault v. Charles Schwab Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.