U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00752
  • Case Name: Brown #313423 v. CoreCivic et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment (Sealed)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 20, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.