U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02401
  • Case Name: Kpou #314416 v. Ramos et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Declaration]
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.