U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Hunter #038313 v. Garrison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 19, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 18, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.