U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00534
  • Case Name: Gethsemani Baptist Church v. San Luis, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.