U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01407
  • Case Name: Garrison #151760 v. NaphCare Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Remark re Docs Received for Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Ct (Rule 72(a) Objection)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Service Unexecuted]
  • April 09, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Court (Rule 72(a) Objection)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.