U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Doe et al v. Unknown Party et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.