U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00738
  • Case Name: Wilson v. PartnerRe Ireland Insurance dac
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.