U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01561
  • Case Name: Wright et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.