U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02417
  • Case Name: Python Partners LLC v. AMCO Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.