U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02435
  • Case Name: Grasse et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.