U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00988
  • Case Name: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina v. Yocum et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.