U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Golden v. Haskins Electric LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals - Fees]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.