U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01067
  • Case Name: Belcher et al v. Tasset
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Discovery Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
  • April 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appear]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.