U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-08044
  • Case Name: Hertel #276681 v. Shinn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: [Bill of Costs - Obj/Ans/Resp]
  • April 10, 2025: [Bill of Costs - Affidavit/Supporting Documents]
  • April 10, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 07, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 12, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [Statement of Facts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.