U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Ghaemmaghami v. Dignity Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 08, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2024
  • November 11, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.