U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02770
  • Case Name: Goseyun et al v. Progressive Preferred Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: [Summons Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.