U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03307
  • Case Name: Crosby et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [New Case Opened]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.