U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02391
  • Case Name: Charon v. Adair et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 14, 2025: [Substitute Party]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.